California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB521 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill June 29, 2015
Bill June 19, 2015
Bill June 2, 2015
Bill April 23, 2015
Bill April 14, 2015