California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB522 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 31, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015