LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB522
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB522
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB522
Compare Versions
AB522 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB522 Amended September 4, 2015
AB522 Amended August 31, 2015
AB522 Amended May 28, 2015
AB522 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB522 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB522 Amended September 4, 2015
AB522 Amended August 31, 2015
AB522 Amended May 28, 2015
AB522 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare