California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB527 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill May 4, 2015
Bill April 29, 2015