LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB527
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB527
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB527
Compare Versions
AB527 Chaptered October 6, 2015
AB527 Enrolled September 16, 2015
AB527 Amended September 4, 2015
AB527 Amended May 4, 2015
AB527 Amended April 29, 2015
AB527 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB527 Chaptered October 6, 2015
AB527 Enrolled September 16, 2015
AB527 Amended September 4, 2015
AB527 Amended May 4, 2015
AB527 Amended April 29, 2015
AB527 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare