Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Liu.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1561.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|