LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB531
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB531
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB531
Compare Versions
AB531 Amended August 11, 2016
AB531 Amended June 21, 2016
AB531 Amended June 9, 2015
AB531 Amended April 21, 2015
AB531 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB531 Amended August 11, 2016
AB531 Amended June 21, 2016
AB531 Amended June 9, 2015
AB531 Amended April 21, 2015
AB531 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare