|
10/03/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 465, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2729.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2735.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2298.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1636.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2015
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|