LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB538
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB538
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB538
Compare Versions
AB538 Chaptered October 3, 2015
AB538 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB538 Amended August 20, 2015
AB538 Amended July 16, 2015
AB538 Amended May 13, 2015
AB538 Amended May 5, 2015
AB538 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB538 Chaptered October 3, 2015
AB538 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB538 Amended August 20, 2015
AB538 Amended July 16, 2015
AB538 Amended May 13, 2015
AB538 Amended May 5, 2015
AB538 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare