|
10/02/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 434, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3059.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2641.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1385.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|