California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB552 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 24, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill April 27, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015