|
09/28/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 330, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2795.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2804.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2341.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 885.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|