California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB555 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2015

Amended

Bill August 26, 2015
Bill August 24, 2015
Bill July 2, 2015