|
09/30/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 363, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2602.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2117.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1804.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|