California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB557 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2015

Amended

Bill August 17, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015