|
10/04/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 478, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 13. Page 3142.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2691.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2308.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 1218.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|