California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB559 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 26, 2015
Bill June 16, 2015