|
08/10/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 151, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 2414.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 1898.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 1140.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|