LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB560
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB560
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB560
Compare Versions
AB560 Chaptered August 10, 2015
AB560 Enrolled July 21, 2015
AB560 Amended June 23, 2015
AB560 Amended April 20, 2015
AB560 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB560 Chaptered August 10, 2015
AB560 Enrolled July 21, 2015
AB560 Amended June 23, 2015
AB560 Amended April 20, 2015
AB560 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare