California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB564 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2015

Amended

Bill September 1, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill July 7, 2015
Bill May 6, 2015
Bill April 22, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015