LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB564
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB564
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB564
Compare Versions
AB564 Chaptered October 5, 2015
AB564 Enrolled September 11, 2015
AB564 Amended September 1, 2015
AB564 Amended July 16, 2015
AB564 Amended July 7, 2015
AB564 Amended May 6, 2015
AB564 Amended April 22, 2015
AB564 Amended March 26, 2015
AB564 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB564 Chaptered October 5, 2015
AB564 Enrolled September 11, 2015
AB564 Amended September 1, 2015
AB564 Amended July 16, 2015
AB564 Amended July 7, 2015
AB564 Amended May 6, 2015
AB564 Amended April 22, 2015
AB564 Amended March 26, 2015
AB564 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare