California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB565 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill June 29, 2016
Bill March 10, 2016
Bill April 28, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015