LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB565
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB565
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB565
Compare Versions
AB565 Chaptered September 22, 2016
AB565 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB565 Amended June 29, 2016
AB565 Amended March 10, 2016
AB565 Amended April 28, 2015
AB565 Amended March 26, 2015
AB565 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB565 Chaptered September 22, 2016
AB565 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB565 Amended June 29, 2016
AB565 Amended March 10, 2016
AB565 Amended April 28, 2015
AB565 Amended March 26, 2015
AB565 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare