|
10/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 685, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 8. Page 2604.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 6. Page 2154.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 4. Page 1552.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/03/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/02/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|