California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB57 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 2, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2015

Amended

Bill August 18, 2015
Bill July 8, 2015
Bill July 2, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015