|
04/21/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3194.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3195.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2739.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1445.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read and amended. (Page 1328.) Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|