California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB573 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 31, 2015
Bill August 18, 2015
Bill July 9, 2015
Bill June 2, 2015
Bill May 11, 2015
Bill May 7, 2015
Bill May 4, 2015