|
09/24/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 550, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6532.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6474.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5115.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 31. Page 1927.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|