California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB575 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016
Bill June 2, 2015
Bill May 13, 2015
Bill May 4, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015
Bill March 25, 2015