|
08/12/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 183, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1793.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1347.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|