California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB583 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 8, 2015

Chaptered

Bill August 12, 2015

Amended

Bill April 15, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015