Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1806.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|