California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB590 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Amended

Bill July 9, 2015
Bill June 16, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill May 4, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015