|
08/12/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 184, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2313.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1791.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1484.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|