LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB596
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB596
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB596
Compare Versions
AB596 Chaptered August 12, 2015
AB596 Enrolled July 13, 2015
AB596 Amended June 9, 2015
AB596 Amended May 5, 2015
AB596 Amended April 6, 2015
AB596 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB596 Chaptered August 12, 2015
AB596 Enrolled July 13, 2015
AB596 Amended June 9, 2015
AB596 Amended May 5, 2015
AB596 Amended April 6, 2015
AB596 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare