|
06/17/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 6, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1759.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after May 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1123.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 883.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/11/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/10/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|