LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB60
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB60
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB60
Compare Versions
AB60 Chaptered June 17, 2015
AB60 Enrolled June 3, 2015
AB60 Amended May 22, 2015
AB60 Amended March 26, 2015
AB60 Amended March 19, 2015
AB60 Amended March 9, 2015
AB60 Introduced December 10, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB60 Chaptered June 17, 2015
AB60 Enrolled June 3, 2015
AB60 Amended May 22, 2015
AB60 Amended March 26, 2015
AB60 Amended March 19, 2015
AB60 Amended March 9, 2015
AB60 Introduced December 10, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare