California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB614 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2015

Amended

Bill June 2, 2015
Bill May 27, 2015
Bill April 16, 2015