LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB614
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB614
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB614
Compare Versions
AB614 Chaptered October 2, 2015
AB614 Enrolled September 8, 2015
AB614 Amended June 2, 2015
AB614 Amended May 27, 2015
AB614 Amended April 16, 2015
AB614 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB614 Chaptered October 2, 2015
AB614 Enrolled September 8, 2015
AB614 Amended June 2, 2015
AB614 Amended May 27, 2015
AB614 Amended April 16, 2015
AB614 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare