California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB617 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 31, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill June 29, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill April 23, 2015
Bill April 14, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015