LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB617
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB617
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB617
Compare Versions
AB617 Chaptered October 9, 2015
AB617 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB617 Amended September 4, 2015
AB617 Amended August 31, 2015
AB617 Amended July 16, 2015
AB617 Amended June 29, 2015
AB617 Amended May 28, 2015
AB617 Amended April 23, 2015
AB617 Amended April 14, 2015
AB617 Amended March 26, 2015
AB617 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB617 Chaptered October 9, 2015
AB617 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB617 Amended September 4, 2015
AB617 Amended August 31, 2015
AB617 Amended July 16, 2015
AB617 Amended June 29, 2015
AB617 Amended May 28, 2015
AB617 Amended April 23, 2015
AB617 Amended April 14, 2015
AB617 Amended March 26, 2015
AB617 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare