California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB621 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 31, 2015
Bill June 25, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015