LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB621
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB621
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB621
Compare Versions
AB621 Chaptered October 10, 2015
AB621 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB621 Amended September 4, 2015
AB621 Amended August 31, 2015
AB621 Amended June 25, 2015
AB621 Amended June 1, 2015
AB621 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB621 Chaptered October 10, 2015
AB621 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB621 Amended September 4, 2015
AB621 Amended August 31, 2015
AB621 Amended June 25, 2015
AB621 Amended June 1, 2015
AB621 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare