Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 10. Page 1905.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|