LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB647
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB647
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB647
Compare Versions
AB647 Amended June 30, 2015
AB647 Amended June 19, 2015
AB647 Amended May 5, 2015
AB647 Amended April 15, 2015
AB647 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB647 Amended June 30, 2015
AB647 Amended June 19, 2015
AB647 Amended May 5, 2015
AB647 Amended April 15, 2015
AB647 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare