Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c) .
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hall.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1442.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|