LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB650
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB650
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB650
Compare Versions
AB650 Enrolled September 2, 2016
AB650 Amended August 31, 2016
AB650 Amended August 19, 2016
AB650 Amended August 15, 2016
AB650 Amended August 2, 2016
AB650 Amended June 23, 2016
AB650 Amended May 27, 2016
AB650 Amended April 14, 2016
AB650 Amended September 4, 2015
AB650 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB650 Enrolled September 2, 2016
AB650 Amended August 31, 2016
AB650 Amended August 19, 2016
AB650 Amended August 15, 2016
AB650 Amended August 2, 2016
AB650 Amended June 23, 2016
AB650 Amended May 27, 2016
AB650 Amended April 14, 2016
AB650 Amended September 4, 2015
AB650 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare