California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB655 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 12, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill July 1, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015