LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB655
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB655
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB655
Compare Versions
AB655 Chaptered September 12, 2016
AB655 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB655 Amended August 1, 2016
AB655 Amended June 15, 2016
AB655 Amended July 1, 2015
AB655 Amended April 6, 2015
AB655 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB655 Chaptered September 12, 2016
AB655 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB655 Amended August 1, 2016
AB655 Amended June 15, 2016
AB655 Amended July 1, 2015
AB655 Amended April 6, 2015
AB655 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare