California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB656 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 3, 2015

Amended

Bill June 22, 2015
Bill May 4, 2015